VTT-DĀRZI, Lauksaimniecības pakalpojumu kooperatīvā sabiedrība
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | Lauksaimniecības pakalpojumu kooperatīvā sabiedrība "VTT-DĀRZI" | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Cooperative society (KB) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 41203026215, 13.03.2006 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | State enterprise register, 13.03.2006 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV47ZZZ41203026215 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Tukuma nov., Pūres pag., Pūre, "Pūre 18", LV-3124
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | "Pūre 18", Pūre, Pūres pag., Tukuma nov., LV-3124 | ||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. 079572. 13.03.2006 | ||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 30.01.2019 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 17.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (17) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 04.06.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 04.06.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 04.06.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 04.06.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 29.07.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 29.07.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 28.07.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 28.07.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 22.07.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 22.07.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 03.05.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 03.05.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 04.05.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 04.05.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 06.05.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 06.05.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 30.04.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 30.04.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 11.05.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 11.05.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 30.04.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 30.04.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 02.05.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 02.05.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 01.05.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 01.05.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 31.03.2011 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 31.03.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 12.05.2010 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 12.05.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 01.05.2009 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 01.05.2009 |
2006 , Annual report , 13.03.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 07.05.2007 | 13.03.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Annual report | 07.05.2007 |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (3) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 07.05.2010 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 07.05.2010 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 07.05.2010 |
Head of the board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (0) | |||
No data |
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 61883 - 61894 | 61883 - 61894 | ||
Net turnover
80387 - 80389 , Major
|
80387 - 80389 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
97702 - 97703
|
97702 - 97703 |
||
Equity capital
36464
|
36464 |
||
Fixed assets
61722 - 61730
|
61722 - 61730 |
||
Balance
47879
|
47879 |
||
Tangible assets
63941 - 108707
|
63941 - 108707 |
||
Liquidity
28426 , Companies
|
28426 |
Companies | |
Profitability
83770 , Companies
|
83770 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (0) | |
No publications found |