Tirdzniecības centrs "MOLS", SIA
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | SIA "Tirdzniecības centrs "MOLS"" | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Limited liability company (SIA) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40003539034, 29.03.2001 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 13.11.2004 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV59ZZZ40003539034 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Rīga, Krasta iela 46, LV-1003
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Krasta iela 46, Rīga, LV-1003 | ||||||||||||
Reorganizations |
|
||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. C48235. 13.11.2004 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 4 695 476.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 01.02.2016) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 27.03.2024 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Yes |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 10.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Contact information | |
Phone |
+371 67030303 |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (31) | |||
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 08.02.2024 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 08.02.2024 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 16.09.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 16.09.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 27.10.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 27.10.2021 |
2020 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 29.10.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Dependency Statement | 29.10.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 15.02.2021 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 15.02.2021 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 24.05.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 24.05.2019 |
2018 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 18.06.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Dependency Statement | 18.06.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 24.08.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 24.08.2018 |
2017 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 10.10.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Dependency Statement | 10.10.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 31.07.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 31.07.2017 |
2016 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 24.08.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Dependency Statement | 24.08.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 20.06.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 20.06.2016 |
2015 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 14.07.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Dependency Statement | 14.07.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 08.05.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 08.05.2015 |
2014 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 15.07.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Dependency Statement | 15.07.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 30.04.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 30.04.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 27.04.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 27.04.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 29.04.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 29.04.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 02.05.2011 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 02.05.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 30.04.2010 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 30.04.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 15.05.2009 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 15.05.2009 |
2007 , Annual report , 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 03.09.2008 | 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Annual report | 03.09.2008 |
2006 , Annual report , 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 06.11.2007 | 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Annual report | 06.11.2007 |
2005 , Annual report , 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 , 17.07.2006 | 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 | Annual report | 17.07.2006 |
2004 , Annual report , 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 , 25.05.2005 | 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 | Annual report | 25.05.2005 |
2004 , Dependency Statement , , 25.05.2005 | Dependency Statement | 25.05.2005 | |
2003 , Annual report , 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 , 07.05.2004 | 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 | Annual report | 07.05.2004 |
2003 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 , 25.05.2005 | 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 | Dependency Statement | 25.05.2005 |
2002 , Annual report , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 02.05.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Annual report | 02.05.2003 |
2002 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 02.05.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Dependency Statement | 02.05.2003 |
2001 , Annual report , 29.03.2001 - 31.12.2001 , 02.05.2002 | 29.03.2001 - 31.12.2001 | Annual report | 02.05.2002 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Due to amendments to the Commercial Law in connection with the official mandate, please become acquainted with the latest version of the statutes and the minutes of shareholders' meeting. This will help you to be sure that in these documents the expiry date of the mandate is not specified.
Actual data. Board (1) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 15.12.2023 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders (1) | ||||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Number of votes | Registered in State Enterprise register |
Sabiedrība ar ierobežotu atbildību "F 8"(40103951662)Rīga, Krustpils iela 12 | ||||||
From 13.12.2023 | 4695476 | 1.00 EUR | 4 695 476.00 EUR | 100.00 % | 4695476 | 15.12.2023 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 08.11.2022 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: on the basis of ownership Sign in |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. List of beneficial owners. (1) | |
Time | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |
15.12.2023 |
From Type of control: on the basis of the business relationship |
Comparative indices (2022 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 47847 - 47855 | 47847 - 47855 | ||
Net turnover
3939 , Major
|
3939 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
113697
|
113697 |
||
Equity capital
113871
|
113871 |
||
Fixed assets
474
|
474 |
||
Balance
707
|
707 |
||
Tangible assets
287
|
287 |
||
Liquidity
55465 , Companies
|
55465 |
Companies | |
Profitability
68371 , Companies
|
68371 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (6) | |
Tirdzniecības centram "MOLS" jauns īpašnieks | 18.12.2023 06:42 |
Lursoft Klientu Portfeļa monitorings vēsta par izmaiņām SIA “Tirdzniecības centrs “MOLS”” dalībnieku sastāvā, kā arī amatpersonās |
|
Tirdzniecības centra “Mols” valdei pievienojies Mārcis Budļevskis | 28.04.2021 09:07 |
Lursoft Klientu Portfeļa monitorings ziņo par izmaiņām SIA “Tirdzniecības centrs “MOLS”” valdē. Lursoft dati rāda, ka valdes locekļa amatu atstājis Patrick Huisman, kurš minēto amatu ieņēma kopš 2019.gada februāra, un viņa vietā stājies Mārcis Budļevskis |
|
Tirdzniecības centrs "Mols" 2019.gadā strādājis ar 2,13 milj. EUR zaudējumiem | 16.02.2021 06:57 |
Klientu Portfeļa monitorings ziņo, ka pārskatu par saimniecisko darbību 2019.gadā iesniedzis SIA “Tirdzniecības centrs “MOLS””. Pārskata informācija liecina, ka 2019.gadā tirdzniecības centra apgrozījums samazinājies, un tas strādājis ar zaudējumiem |
|
“Tirdzniecības centrs “Mols” valdē izmaiņas | 21.02.2019 10:30 |
Tirdzniecības centra “Mols” īpašnieka, apsaimniekotāja un attīstītāja SIA "Tirdzniecības centrs "Mols"" valdē iecelti četri jauni valdes locekļi un viens valdes loceklis uzņēmumu atstājis, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Tirdzniecības centru “Mols” un “Dole” īpašnieks pārjauno komercķīlas | 04.12.2017 05:24 |
Tirdzniecības centru “Mols” un “Dole” īpašnieks Norvēģijā reģistrētais uzņēmums “AMD Holding AS” pārjaunojis vairākas komercķīlas, palielinot ar komercķīlu nodrošināto prasījumu maksimālo summu par 7,7 miljoniem eiro, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu Portfelis. |
|
Tirdzniecības centrs Mols valdē iecelta Barbara Topolska | 09.11.2016 11:05 |
Izmaiņas valdes sastāvā vakar reģistrētas tirdzniecības centrs Mols īpašniekam SIA Tirdzniecības centrs „Mols”, ziņo Klientu Portfeļa monitorings. Uzņēmuma valdes locekļa amatu atstājot Brian Robert Jenkins, uzņēmuma valdē iecelta Barbara Topolska no Polijas. |