PRIEDES 98, Līvānu pilsētas garāžu kooperatīvā sabiedrība
Basic data | |
Name | Līvānu pilsētas garāžu kooperatīvā sabiedrība "PRIEDES 98" |
Legal form | Cooperative society (KB) |
Registration number, date | 41503021575, 09.02.1999 |
Register, Included in The Register | State enterprise register, 09.02.1999 |
SEPA identifier | LV38ZZZ41503021575 |
Data from the VAT Register | Doesn't haveCheck in EU VAT register |
Legal address |
Legal address:
Līvānu nov., Līvāni, Lāčplēša iela 18A, LV-5316 ***
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
Postal address | Lāčplēša iela 18A, Līvāni, Līvānu nov., LV-5316 |
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. 28854. 09.02.1999 |
Activity code (NACE) |
|
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 21.04.2020 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 09.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (20) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 01.07.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 01.07.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 01.02.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 01.02.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 14.06.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 14.06.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 23.03.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 23.03.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 03.03.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 03.03.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 03.03.2020 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 03.03.2020 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 03.03.2020 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 03.03.2020 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 02.03.2020 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 02.03.2020 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 06.03.2020 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 06.03.2020 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 04.03.2020 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 04.03.2020 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 04.03.2020 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 04.03.2020 |
2005 , Annual report , 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 , 02.05.2006 | 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 | Annual report | 02.05.2006 |
2002 , Annual report , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 14.05.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Annual report | 14.05.2003 |
2001 , Annual report , 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 , 06.05.2002 | 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 | Annual report | 06.05.2002 |
2000 , Annual report , 01.01.2000 - 31.12.2000 , 04.05.2001 | 01.01.2000 - 31.12.2000 | Annual report | 04.05.2001 |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (3) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 21.04.2020 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 21.04.2020 |
Head of the board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 21.04.2020 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (0) | |||
No data |
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 42918 - 42933 | 42918 - 42933 | ||
Net turnover
84118 - 108574 , Major
|
84118 - 108574 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
74970 - 74985
|
74970 - 74985 |
||
Equity capital
42335
|
42335 |
||
Fixed assets
33961
|
33961 |
||
Balance
59440 - 59442
|
59440 - 59442 |
||
Tangible assets
30797
|
30797 |
||
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (0) | |
No publications found |