MĀJA 1866, Dzīvokļu īpašnieku kooperatīvā sabiedrība
Basic data | |
Name | Dzīvokļu īpašnieku kooperatīvā sabiedrība "MĀJA 1866" |
Legal form | Cooperative society (KB) |
Registration number, date | 40003634413, 12.06.2003 |
Register, Included in The Register | State enterprise register, 12.06.2003 |
SEPA identifier | LV79ZZZ40003634413 |
Data from the VAT Register | Doesn't haveCheck in EU VAT register |
Legal address | Legal address: Rīga, Skolas iela 4, LV-1010 Other registered in this address |
Postal address | Skolas iela 4, Rīga, LV-1010 |
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. 76276. 12.06.2003 |
Activity code (NACE) |
|
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 31.07.2024 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 06.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (20) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 29.05.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 29.05.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 01.06.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 01.06.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 12.07.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 12.07.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 31.07.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 31.07.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 31.07.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 31.07.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 30.04.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 30.04.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 02.05.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 02.05.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 29.04.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 29.04.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 01.05.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 01.05.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 06.05.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 06.05.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 30.04.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 30.04.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 30.04.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 30.04.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 27.08.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 27.08.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 05.08.2011 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 05.08.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 21.05.2010 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 21.05.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 13.01.2010 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 13.01.2010 |
2007 , Annual report , 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 29.04.2008 | 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Annual report | 29.04.2008 |
2006 , Annual report , 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 07.05.2007 | 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Annual report | 07.05.2007 |
2005 , Annual report , 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 , 02.05.2006 | 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 | Annual report | 02.05.2006 |
2004 , Annual report , 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 , 06.05.2005 | 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 | Annual report | 06.05.2005 |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (3) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 |
Head of the board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (3) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a representative of the executive or administrative body Sign in |
|||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a representative of the executive or administrative body Sign in |
|||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 31.07.2024 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a representative of the executive or administrative body Sign in |
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 52546 - 52557 | 52546 - 52557 | ||
Net turnover
58956 - 58957 , Major
|
58956 - 58957 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
92073
|
92073 |
||
Equity capital
81518 - 81522
|
81518 - 81522 |
||
Fixed assets
65540 - 65583
|
65540 - 65583 |
||
Balance
65818 - 65820
|
65818 - 65820 |
||
Tangible assets
61986 - 62026
|
61986 - 62026 |
||
Liquidity
65238 - 65241 , Companies
|
65238 - 65241 |
Companies | |
Profitability
75074 , Companies
|
75074 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (0) | |
No publications found |