Luminor Asset Management, IPAS
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | Luminor Asset Management IPAS Previous names | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Joint stock company (AS) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40003699053, 10.09.2004 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 10.09.2004 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV23ZZZ40003699053 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Rīga, Skanstes iela 12, LV-1013
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Skanstes iela 12, Rīga, LV-1013 | ||||||||||||
Beneficial owners reported | Yes | ||||||||||||
Reorganizations |
|
||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. K118290. 11.11.2011 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 5 000 000.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 02.08.2018) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 19.08.2024 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 05.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Contact information | |
Phone |
+371 1880 |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (22) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 02.04.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 02.04.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 30.03.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 30.03.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 01.04.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 01.04.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 28.04.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 28.04.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 31.03.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 31.03.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 02.04.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 02.04.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 27.03.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 27.03.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 02.03.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 02.03.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 03.03.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 03.03.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 01.04.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 01.04.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 27.03.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 27.03.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 28.03.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 28.03.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 30.03.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 30.03.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 09.05.2011 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 09.05.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 09.04.2010 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 09.04.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 31.03.2009 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 31.03.2009 |
2007 , Annual report , 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 25.03.2008 | 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Annual report | 25.03.2008 |
2007 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 25.03.2008 | 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Dependency Statement | 25.03.2008 |
2006 , Annual report , 01.02.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 31.03.2007 | 01.02.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Annual report | 31.03.2007 |
2006 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 31.03.2007 | 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Dependency Statement | 31.03.2007 |
2005 , Annual report , 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 , 27.03.2006 | 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 | Annual report | 27.03.2006 |
2005 , Dependency Statement , 10.09.2004 - 31.12.2005 , 27.03.2006 | 10.09.2004 - 31.12.2005 | Dependency Statement | 27.03.2006 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (4) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 04.02.2022 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 17.09.2020 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 19.08.2024 |
Head of the board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 04.10.2023 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Lithuania |
Actual data. Council (4) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 03.06.2024 |
Chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 07.10.2022 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 07.10.2022 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Finland | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 03.06.2024 |
Deputy chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. Council (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
03.06.2024 |
From Deputy chairperson of the Council |
||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
03.06.2024 |
From Member of the Council |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders (1) | |||||
From 01.07.2023 information about the owners of JSC's registered shares, which are registered in the JSC's shareholder register, must be registered in the Enterprise Register of the Republic of Latvia. The Transition Rules of Commercial Law require the Board of JSC to make such information public by 30.09.2024. | |||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Registered in State Enterprise register |
Luminor Bank AS(Registration number: 11315936)Liivalaia tn 45, Kesklinna linnaosa, Harju maakond, Tallina, 10145 | |||||
From 07.01.2019 | 5000000 | 1.00 EUR | 5 000 000.00 EUR | 100.00 % | |
Document country on the date of registration: Estonia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 14.09.2020 | United States | United States | |
Type of control: other Type of control: on the basis of ownership Sign in |
Awards | |
|
Comparative indices | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 56270 - 56288 | 56270 - 56288 | ||
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (0) | |
No publications found |