ELVI Latvija, SIA
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | SIA "ELVI Latvija" Previous names | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Limited liability company (SIA) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 50103276411, 25.02.2010 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 25.02.2010 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV65ZZZ50103276411 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Rīga, Bērzaunes iela 7, LV-1039
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Bērzaunes iela 7, Rīga, LV-1039 | ||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. K166952. 08.11.2013 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 1 002 820.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 09.03.2022) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 10.11.2023 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 10.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Contact information | |
Phone |
+371 67618236 |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (16) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 23.05.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 23.05.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 15.06.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 15.06.2023 |
2022 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 20.06.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Consolidated Statement | 20.06.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 16.08.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 16.08.2022 |
2021 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 25.10.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Consolidated Statement | 25.10.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 15.07.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 15.07.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 09.06.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 09.06.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 29.04.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 29.04.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 25.04.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 25.04.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 04.05.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 04.05.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 28.04.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 28.04.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 20.03.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 20.03.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 12.03.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 12.03.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 03.05.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 03.05.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 29.04.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 29.04.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 25.02.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 29.04.2011 | 25.02.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 29.04.2011 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (3) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 16.11.2020 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 16.11.2020 |
Head of the board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 10.11.2023 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. Board (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
16.11.2020 |
From Together with at least 1 |
||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
16.11.2020 |
From Member of the Board
From Together with at least 1 |
Actual data. List of procurations (1) | ||||
Time | Range of rights | Registered in State Enterprise register | ||
Procuration | ||||
From 20.01.2011 |
Without rights to dispossess real property Without rights to pledge real property Without rights to encumber real property with rights in rem Right of sole representation |
20.01.2011 | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | ||||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | ||||
Actual data. List of shareholders (3) | ||||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Number of votes | Registered in State Enterprise register |
FORTIS VM SIA(40203297583)Siguldas nov., Sigulda, Vidus iela 1 | ||||||
From 16.10.2023 | 670705 | 1.00 EUR | 670 705.00 EUR | 66.88189 % | 670705 | 17.10.2023 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | ||||||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | ||||||
From 16.10.2023 | 331410 | 1.00 EUR | 331 410.00 EUR | 33.04781 % | 331410 | 17.10.2023 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | ||||||
SIA "Realto Capital"(40103289128)Rīga, Braslas iela 29A - 4 | ||||||
From 16.10.2023 | 705 | 1.00 EUR | 705.00 EUR | 0.0703 % | 705 | 17.10.2023 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 21.12.2017 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a member Type of control: on the basis of ownership Sign in |
Awards | |
|
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 78342 - 78368 | 78342 - 78368 | ||
Net turnover
1957 , Major
|
1957 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
6183
|
6183 |
||
Equity capital
2954
|
2954 |
||
Fixed assets
4034
|
4034 |
||
Balance
3444
|
3444 |
||
Tangible assets
5790
|
5790 |
||
Liquidity
52276 - 52277 , Companies
|
52276 - 52277 |
Companies | |
Profitability
23422 , Companies
|
23422 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (4) | |
"ELVI Latvija" valdei pievienojusies Laila Vārtukapteine | 13.11.2023 06:27 |
Lursoft Klientu Portfeļa monitorings ziņo, ka SIA “ELVI Latvija” valdei pievienojusies Laila Vārtukapteine |
|
"ELVI" zīmola turētājs pērn apgrozījis 4,25 milj. EUR | 26.10.2022 06:22 |
Zīmola “ELVI” turētājs un franšīzes devējs SIA “ELVI Latvija”, 2021.gadā palielinājis apgrozījumu līdz 4,25 milj. EUR |
|
ELVI Latvija turpinās piesaistīt jaunus franšīzes dalībniekus | 10.06.2020 08:46 |
Zīmola ELVI turētājs un franšīzes devējs SIA “ELVI Latvija” turpinājis darbu pie tīkla attīstības, kā arī pie veikalu rekonstrukcijām un to labiekārtošanas. |
|
Elvi Latvija pērn palielinājusi apgrozījumu par 15,9% | 23.03.2015 12:17 |
Aizvadītajā gadā SIA Elvi Latvija piesaistījusi 4 jaunus franšīzes dalībniekus un atvērusi 9 jaunus ELVI veikalus, no kuriem viens pārveidots no Gastranoms tīkla, un 5 Elvi mazais veikalus, liecina gada pārskatā publicētā informācija. |