Rīgas kuģu būvētava, Akciju sabiedrība
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | Akciju sabiedrība "Rīgas kuģu būvētava" Previous names | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Joint stock company (AS) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40003045892, 05.12.1991 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 26.08.2004 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV91ZZZ40003045892 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address | Legal address: Rīga, Gāles iela 2, LV-1015 Other registered in this address | ||||||||||||
Postal address | Gāles iela 2, Rīga, LV-1015 | ||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. C39685. 26.08.2004 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 16 340 949.80 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 26.05.2015) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 28.06.2024 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual legal protection process | Yes |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Actual collateral for shares owned by a person | Yes |
Tax debts (as of date) |
334 640.45 EUR as of 05.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Contact information | |
Phone |
+371 27808877 |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (31) | |||
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 21.09.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 21.09.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 25.10.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 25.10.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 19.05.2022 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 19.05.2022 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 19.02.2021 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 19.02.2021 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 27.01.2020 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 27.01.2020 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 10.07.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 10.07.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 17.07.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 17.07.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 17.06.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 17.06.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 19.05.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 19.05.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 27.05.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 27.05.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 30.05.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 30.05.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 28.05.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 28.05.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 , 31.05.2011 | 01.01.2010 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 31.05.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 , 27.05.2010 | 01.01.2009 - 31.12.2009 | Annual report | 27.05.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 , 30.04.2009 | 01.01.2008 - 31.12.2008 | Annual report | 30.04.2009 |
2007 , Annual report , 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 30.04.2008 | 01.01.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Annual report | 30.04.2008 |
2006 , Annual report , 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 , 03.05.2007 | 01.01.2006 - 31.12.2006 | Annual report | 03.05.2007 |
2005 , Annual report , 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 , 27.07.2006 | 01.01.2005 - 31.12.2005 | Annual report | 27.07.2006 |
2004 , Annual report , 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 , 01.08.2005 | 01.01.2004 - 31.12.2004 | Annual report | 01.08.2005 |
2003 , Annual report , 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 , 30.07.2004 | 01.01.2003 - 31.12.2003 | Annual report | 30.07.2004 |
2002 , Annual report , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 31.07.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Annual report | 31.07.2003 |
2002 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 01.08.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Dependency Statement | 01.08.2003 |
2002 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 , 01.08.2003 | 01.01.2002 - 31.12.2002 | Consolidated Statement | 01.08.2003 |
2001 , Annual report , 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 , 29.07.2002 | 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 | Annual report | 29.07.2002 |
2001 , Dependency Statement , 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2002 , 29.07.2002 | 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2002 | Dependency Statement | 29.07.2002 |
2001 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 , 29.07.2002 | 01.01.2001 - 31.12.2001 | Consolidated Statement | 29.07.2002 |
2000 , Annual report , 01.01.2000 - 31.12.2000 , 01.08.2001 | 01.01.2000 - 31.12.2000 | Annual report | 01.08.2001 |
1999 , Annual report , 01.01.1999 - 31.12.1999 , 03.07.2000 | 01.01.1999 - 31.12.1999 | Annual report | 03.07.2000 |
1998 , Annual report , 01.01.1998 - 31.12.1998 , 31.10.2002 | 01.01.1998 - 31.12.1998 | Annual report | 31.10.2002 |
1997 , Annual report , 01.01.1997 - 31.12.1997 , 31.10.2002 | 01.01.1997 - 31.12.1997 | Annual report | 31.10.2002 |
1996 , Annual report , , | Annual report |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Due to amendments to the Commercial Law in connection with the official mandate, please become acquainted with the latest version of the statutes and the minutes of shareholders' meeting. This will help you to be sure that in these documents the expiry date of the mandate is not specified.
Actual data. Board (3) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Board/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. Council (5) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Deputy chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.06.2024 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders (2) | |||||
From 01.07.2023 information about the owners of JSC's registered shares, which are registered in the JSC's shareholder register, must be registered in the Enterprise Register of the Republic of Latvia. The Transition Rules of Commercial Law require the Board of JSC to make such information public by 30.09.2024. | |||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Registered in State Enterprise register |
citas juridiskas un privātpersonas |
|||||
From 31.12.2015 | 5852395 | 1.40 EUR | 8 193 353.00 EUR | 50.14 % | |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||||
Remars-Rīga, Akciju sabiedrība(40003197429)Rīga, Gāles iela 2 Actual address: Rīga, Pils iela 16 - 1 | |||||
From 31.12.2015 | 5819712 | 1.40 EUR | 8 147 596.80 EUR | 49.86 % | |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
The beneficial owner is a shareholder in a joint-stock company, shares of which are listed on the regulated market and control over the legal entity exercises only from the shareholder's status. Registered 07.01.2021 |
Comparative indices (2022 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 3442 - 3497 | 3442 - 3497 | ||
Net turnover
5727 , Major
|
5727 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
1149
|
1149 |
||
Equity capital
3065
|
3065 |
||
Fixed assets
1325
|
1325 |
||
Balance
1712
|
1712 |
||
Tangible assets
1155
|
1155 |
||
Liquidity
54534 , Companies
|
54534 |
Companies | |
Profitability
81043 , Companies
|
81043 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (16) | |
Apstiprināti grozījumi Rīgas kuģu būvētavas tiesiskās aizsardzības procesā | 29.01.2021 07:18 |
Lursoft pieejamā informācija liecina, ka tiesa apstiprinājusi AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” tiesiskās aizsardzības procesa grozījumus |
|
"Remars - Rīga" ticis pie jauna nodrošinājuma | 25.02.2019 05:43 |
Loģistikas uzņēmumam AS “Remars-Rīga” 22.februārī atcelti divi iepriekš piemērotie nodrošinājumi, tai pašā laikā uzņēmumam piemērots jauns nodrošinājums, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
“Rīgas kuģu būvētavai” piemēroti divi jauni nodrošinājumi | 03.01.2019 06:03 |
Ar Valsts ieņēmumu dienesta (VID) Nodokļu parādu piedziņas pārvaldes lēmumiem AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” piemēroti divi jauni nodrošinājumi, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
VID "Rīgas kuģu būvētavai" piemēro jaunu nodrošinājumu | 14.12.2018 08:34 |
Valsts ieņēmumu dienesta (VID) Nodokļu parādu piedziņas pārvalde AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” piemērojusi jaunu nodrošinājumu, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Reģistrētas izmaiņas “Rīgas kuģu būvētavas” padomē | 07.12.2018 05:58 |
AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” amatpersonās 6.decembrī reģistrētas izmaiņas - uzņēmuma padomi atstājuši padomes locekļi Valentīna Andrējeva un Linards Baumanis, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
VID piemēro vēl vienu nodrošinājumu “Remars-Rīga” | 14.11.2018 07:06 |
Loģistikas uzņēmumam AS “Remars-Rīga”, kas ir lielākais AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” akcionārs, otrdien, 13.novembrī, piemērots jauns nodrošinājums - aizliegums komercķīlas reģistrācijai, pārjaunošanai un grozīšanai, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
“Remars-Rīga” iecelts jauns valdes loceklis | 30.08.2018 10:09 |
AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” lielākā akcionāra, ostu loģistikas kompānijas AS “Remars-Rīga” valdes locekļa amatā iecelts Ainārs Tropiņš, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
“Remars-Rīga” valdē izmaiņas | 03.08.2018 06:38 |
Ostu loģistikas kompānijas AS “Remars-Rīga”, kas ir lielākais AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” akcionārs, valdes locekļa amatu atstājis Jevgēnijs Djadela, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Jau ceturto reizi šogad prasa “Tosmares kuģubūvētavas” maksātnespēju | 26.07.2018 06:44 |
Kurzemes rajona tiesa (Talsos) trešdien, 25.jūlijā ierosinājusi kuģu būves un remonta uzņēmuma AS "Tosmares kuģubūvētava” maksātnespējas procesa lietu, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Tiesā prasa AS “Remars-Rīga” maksātnespēju | 24.07.2018 06:31 |
Rīgas pilsētas Vidzemes priekšpilsētas tiesa 18.jūlijā ierosinājusi uzņēmuma AS “Remars-Rīga”, kas ir lielākais AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” akcionārs, maksātnespējas procesa lietu, ziņo "Lursoft" Klientu portfelis. |
|
Prasa AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” maksātnespēju | 13.03.2018 10:44 |
Rīgas pilsētas Vidzemes priekšpilsētas tiesa 27.februārī ierosinājusi kuģu būves un remonta uzņēmuma AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” maksātnespējas procesa lietu, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Vēl viena kompānija prasa “Tosmares kuģubūvētavu” maksātnespēju | 02.03.2018 04:51 |
Kurzemes rajona tiesa (Liepājā) 28.februārī ierosinājusi kuģu būves un remonta uzņēmuma AS "Tosmares kuģubūvētava” maksātnespējas procesa lietu, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Ierosināta “Tosmares kuģubūvētavas” maksātnespējas lieta | 25.01.2018 15:41 |
Liepājas tiesa 23.janvārī ierosinājusi kuģu būves un remonta uzņēmuma AS "Tosmares kuģubūvētava” maksātnespējas procesa lietu, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Nodokļu parāda dēļ “Remars-Rīga” piemēro nodrošinājumu | 23.11.2017 05:45 |
Loģistikas uzņēmumam AS “Remars-Rīga”, kas ir lielākais AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” akcionārs, trešdien, 22.novembrī piemērots nodrošinājums - aizliegums komercķīlas reģistrācijai, pārjaunošanai un grozīšanai, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu Portfelis. |
|
Reģistrē izmaiņas “Rīgas kuģu būvētavas” valdē | 21.08.2017 10:50 |
AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētava” valdē piektdien, 18.augustā, reģistrētas izmaiņas - līdzšinējais ilggadējais valdes loceklis Einārs Buks iecelts par valdes priekšsēdētāju, un uzņēmuma valdē iecelts jauns loceklis Ainārs Tropiņš, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu Portfelis. |
|
“Rīgas kuģu būvētava” reģistrē jaunu komercķīlu | 05.04.2017 10:17 |
AS “Rīgas kuģu būvētāva” reģistrējusi jaunu komercķīlu, par labu AS “Baltikums Bank” ieķīlājot visu mantu, ziņo Klientu portfeļa monitorings. |