MR Group, SIA
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | SIA "MR Group" | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Limited liability company (SIA) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40203204244, 01.04.2019 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 01.04.2019 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV47ZZZ40203204244 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Olaines nov., Olaines pag., Stūnīši, Vēju iela 6, LV-2127
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Vēju iela 6, Stūnīši, Olaines pag., Olaines nov., LV-2127 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 15 000.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 01.04.2019) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 05.05.2021 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 04.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (3) | |||
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 31.07.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 31.07.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 29.07.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 29.07.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.04.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 27.07.2020 | 01.04.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 27.07.2020 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 30.11.2020 |
Head of the board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.04.2019 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. Board (1) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
30.11.2020 |
From Member of the Board |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders (2) | |||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Registered in State Enterprise register |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||||
From 26.10.2020 | 50 | 150.00 EUR | 7 500.00 EUR | 50.00 % | 30.10.2020 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||||
From 26.10.2020 | 50 | 150.00 EUR | 7 500.00 EUR | 50.00 % | 30.10.2020 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (2) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 30.10.2020 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a member Sign in |
|||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 30.10.2020 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a member Sign in |
Comparative indices (2021 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 138217 - 138237 | 138217 - 138237 | ||
Net turnover 17674 , Major | 17674 | Major | |
Profit or loss 17869 | 17869 | ||
Equity capital 27070 | 27070 | ||
Fixed assets 40296 | 40296 | ||
Balance 27411 | 27411 | ||
Tangible assets 61295 - 61308 | 61295 - 61308 | ||
Liquidity 49386 - 49387 , Companies | 49386 - 49387 | Companies | |
Profitability 35885 , Companies | 35885 | Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (1) | |
Elīna Maligina kopā ar “Olainfarm” bijušo valdes locekli nodibina jaunu uzņēmumu | 08.04.2019 07:16 |
Uzņēmumēja Valērija Maligina atraitne Elīna Maligina kļuvusi par valdes priekšsēdētāju jaundibinātam uzņēmumam SIA “MR Group”, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |