BaltCap Latvia Venture Capital Fund AIF, KS
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | KS "BaltCap Latvia Venture Capital Fund AIF" Previous names | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Commanding enterprise (KS) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40103266178, 28.12.2009 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 28.12.2009 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV65ZZZ40103266178 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Rīga, Jaunmoku iela 34, LV-1046
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Jaunmoku iela 34, Rīga, LV-1046 | ||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. K100195. 28.12.2009 | ||||||||||||
Share | 317.29 EUR | ||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 22.03.2023 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | 22.03.2023. 13.01.2023. biedru kopsapulces protokols |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Yes |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 16.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (13) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 28.06.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 28.06.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 31.05.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 31.05.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 22.04.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 22.04.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 20.04.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 20.04.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 07.04.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 07.04.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 11.03.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 11.03.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 17.04.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 17.04.2018 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 20.04.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 20.04.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 17.07.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 17.07.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 , 27.04.2014 | 01.01.2013 - 31.12.2013 | Annual report | 27.04.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 , 02.04.2013 | 01.01.2012 - 31.12.2012 | Annual report | 02.04.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 , 16.04.2012 | 01.01.2011 - 31.12.2011 | Annual report | 16.04.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 28.12.2009 - 31.12.2010 , 15.04.2011 | 28.12.2009 - 31.12.2010 | Annual report | 15.04.2011 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Officials (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 22.03.2023 |
Liquidator/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 22.03.2023 |
Liquidator/ Together with at least 1 |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of members (14) | |||
Time | Share | Status | Registered in State Enterprise register |
INVL Asset Management UAB(Registration number: 126263073)Gyneju g. 14, Vilņa | |||
From 20.07.2017 | 14.23 EUR | Limited partnert | 20.07.2017 |
Document country on the date of registration: Lithuania | |||
Attīstības finanšu institūcija Altum, Akciju sabiedrība(50103744891)Rīga, Doma laukums 4 | |||
From 16.07.2015 | 200.62 EUR | Limited partnert | 16.07.2015 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Agenda Capital, Sabiedrība ar ierobežotu atbildību(40103230895)Garkalnes nov., Bukulti, Kalnavīgantu iela 10 Actual address: Rīga, Kalēju iela 74 - 23 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 2.85 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
A.I.K. CAPITAL, SIA(40003497239)Rīga, Braslas iela 29A-4 Actual address: Rīga, Braslas iela 29A - 4 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 9.96 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Aktsiaselts LHV Varahaldus(Registration number: 10572453)Igaunija, Tallina, Tartu iela 2, 10145 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 11.38 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Estonia | |||
BaltCap Latvia Investments, KS(40103264425)Rīga, Kārļa Ulmaņa gatve 86F Actual address: Rīga, Jaunmoku iela 34 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 18.50 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Citadele Asset Management,(40003577500)Rīga, Republikas laukums 2A Actual name: "CBL Asset Management" Ieguldījumu pārvaldes akciju sabiedrība | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 15.65 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Citadele atklātais pensiju fonds, Akciju sabiedrība(40003397312)Rīga, Republikas laukums 2A Actual name: Akciju sabiedrība "CBL Atklātais pensiju fonds" | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 7.11 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Finasta Asset Management, Ieguldījumu pārvaldes akciju sabiedrība(40003605043)Rīga, Smilšu iela 7-1 Actual name: Ieguldījumu pārvaldes akciju sabiedrība "INVL Asset Management"Actual address: Rīga, Elizabetes iela 10B - 1 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 4.27 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
PINUS E, Sabiedrība ar ierobežotu atbildību(40003471761)Rīga, Ūdens iela 11/23 Actual address: Rīga, Kaļķu iela 7 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 1.42 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Pirmais Slēgtais Pensiju Fonds, Akciju sabiedrība(40003448943)Rīga, Brīvības iela 180 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 2.85 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
SEB Wealth Management,(40003525797)Rīga, Antonijas iela 9-12 Actual name: Ieguldījumu pārvaldes akciju sabiedrība "SEB Investment Management"Actual address: Rīga, Antonijas iela 9 - 12 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 7.11 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Swedbank Ieguldījumu Pārvaldes Sabiedrība,(40003337582)Rīga, Balasta dambis 1a Actual address: Rīga, Balasta dambis 15 | |||
From 12.06.2014 | 21.34 EUR | Limited partnert | 12.06.2014 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
SIA BaltCap AIFP(50003625501)Rīga, Jaunmoku iela 34 | |||
From 28.12.2009 | - | Personally responsible member | 02.01.2017 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Not possible to identify a beneficiary of the legal entity. Registered 02.03.2018 |
Comparative indices | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 77736 - 77750 | 77736 - 77750 | ||
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (7) | |
"Pure Chocolate" vadīs Normunds Sala | 03.01.2022 06:52 |
SIA “Pure Chocolate” valdes priekšsēdētāja amatu atstājot uzņēmuma līdzīpašniekam Mārtiņam Čakstem, par jauno valdes priekšsēdētāju aizvadītā gada 30.decembrī iecelts Normunds Sala |
|
"Pure Chocolate" padomi atstājis Rolands Gulbis | 14.09.2020 09:03 |
Klientu Portfeļa monitoringa dati rāda, ka aizvadītajā nedēļā no SIA “Pure Chocolate” padomes locekļa amata atcelts Rolands Gulbis. |
|
Kokapstrādes uzņēmums "EKJU" aizvadīto gadu vērtē kā veiksmīgu | 29.07.2020 08:28 |
Kokapstrādes uzņēmums SIA “EKJU” pagājušo saimniecisko darbību vērtē kā sekmīgu. “Ir palielināti realizācijas un peļņas rādītāji. |
|
"Pure Chocolate" valdi atstājis Kārlis Kvāls | 11.04.2019 13:42 |
Saldumu ražotāja SIA "Pure Chocolate" valdē ceturtdien, 11.aprīlī reģistrētas izmaiņas - valdes locekļa amatu atstājis Kārlis Kvāls, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
“Pure Chocolate” apgrozījums pērn sarucis līdz 2,92 miljoniem eiro | 25.09.2018 07:33 |
Saldumu ražotāja SIA "Pure Chocolate" apgrozījums 2017.gadā, salīdzinot ar 2016.gadu, samazinājies par 15,4% jeb 531 tūkstoti eiro un bija 2,920 miljoni eiro, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
“Pure Chocolate” padomē ieceļ Rolandu Gulbi | 18.01.2018 05:19 |
Saldumu ražotāja SIA "Pure Chocolate" padomi atstājis Pēteris Žimants, un viņa vietā par padomes locekli iecelts holdingkompānijas SIA “Rīgas tirdzniecības osta” valdes loceklis Rolands Gulbis, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |
|
Par kosmētikas ražotāja “Stenders” vienīgo īpašnieku kļūst “CICC Ehealthcare Investment Fund” | 03.10.2017 12:44 |
Šonedēļ Uzņēmumu reģistrā ierakstītas apjomīgas izmaiņas kosmētikas ražotājā SIA “Stenders” - mainījušies uzņēmuma īpašnieki un vadība, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu Portfelis. |