EMPO Ventures AIFP, SIA
Basic data | |
Name | SIA EMPO Ventures AIFP Previous names |
Legal form | Limited liability company (SIA) |
Registration number, date | 40203247188, 21.05.2020 |
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 21.05.2020 |
SEPA identifier | LV97ZZZ40203247188 |
Data from the VAT Register | Doesn't haveCheck in EU VAT register |
Legal address |
Legal address:
Jūrmala, Jūrkalnes iela 5, LV-2011
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
Postal address | Jūrkalnes iela 5, Jūrmala, LV-2011 |
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 15 000.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 21.05.2020) |
Activity code (NACE) |
|
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 28.04.2023 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 13.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (4) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 01.06.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 01.06.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 29.03.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 29.03.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 02.08.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 02.08.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 21.05.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 05.08.2021 | 21.05.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 05.08.2021 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Board (1) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 23.03.2022 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. Board (1) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
23.03.2022 |
From Head of the board
From Together with at least 1 |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders (1) | |||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Registered in State Enterprise register |
Stream Asset Management SIA(40203309505)Jūrmala, Jūrkalnes iela 5 Actual address: Jūrmala, Rīgas iela 90 - 1 | |||||
From 17.03.2022 | 15000 | 1.00 EUR | 15 000.00 EUR | 100.00 % | 23.03.2022 |
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 21.05.2020 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a representative of the executive or administrative body Type of control: on the basis of ownership Sign in |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. List of beneficial owners. (1) | |
Time | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |
23.03.2022 |
From Type of control: as a member |
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 146169 - 146195 | 146169 - 146195 | ||
Net turnover
84118 - 108574 , Major
|
84118 - 108574 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
78995 - 79004
|
78995 - 79004 |
||
Equity capital
82916 - 82920
|
82916 - 82920 |
||
Fixed assets
68001 - 108572
|
68001 - 108572 |
||
Balance
99912 - 99982
|
99912 - 99982 |
||
Tangible assets
63887 - 108573
|
63887 - 108573 |
||
Liquidity
91103 - 91104 , Companies
|
91103 - 91104 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (1) | |
"Olainfarm" valdi atstājis Lauris Macijevskis | 17.06.2020 08:41 |
Klientu Portfeļa monitorings ziņo par vakar reģistrētajām izmaiņām AS “Olainfarm” valdē. Kā liecina Lursoft izziņā pieejamā informācija, farmācijas uzņēmuma valdes locekļa amatu atstājis Lauris Macijevskis. |