Longo Group, AS
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | AS Longo Group Previous names | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Joint stock company (AS) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 42103081417, 30.10.2017 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 30.10.2017 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV06ZZZ42103081417 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Rīga, Mūkusalas iela 72A, LV-1004
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | Mūkusalas iela 72A, Rīga, LV-1004 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 13 034 872.10 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 22.07.2024) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 22.07.2024 | ||||||||||||
The State support | The State support history (Actual record: 07.07.2020) |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Yes |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 05.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (10) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 23.05.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 23.05.2024 |
2023 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 23.05.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Consolidated Statement | 23.05.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 21.05.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 21.05.2023 |
2022 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 26.05.2023 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Consolidated Statement | 26.05.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 25.05.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 25.05.2022 |
2021 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 23.05.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Consolidated Statement | 23.05.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 19.10.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 19.10.2021 |
2020 , Consolidated Statement , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 19.10.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Consolidated Statement | 19.10.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 07.12.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 07.12.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 30.10.2017 - 31.12.2018 , 28.04.2019 | 30.10.2017 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 28.04.2019 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2023 | Sign in | ||
2022 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Due to amendments to the Commercial Law in connection with the official mandate, please become acquainted with the latest version of the statutes and the minutes of shareholders' meeting. This will help you to be sure that in these documents the expiry date of the mandate is not specified.
Actual data. Board (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 26.06.2023 |
Head of the board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 28.12.2020 |
Member of the Board/ Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Netherlands |
Actual data. Council (5) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.03.2021 |
Deputy chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.03.2021 |
Chairperson of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.03.2021 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.03.2021 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 01.03.2021 |
Member of the Council |
||
Document country on the date of registration: United Kingdom |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of shareholders | ||||||
From 01.07.2023 information about the owners of JSC's registered shares, which are registered in the JSC's shareholder register, must be registered in the Enterprise Register of the Republic of Latvia. The Transition Rules of Commercial Law require the Board of JSC to make such information public by 30.09.2024. | ||||||
Time | Shares | Value | Share | Percent | Number of votes | Registered in State Enterprise register |
Sign in |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (1) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 23.03.2018 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: on the basis of ownership Sign in |
Changes in personal data. Actual data. List of beneficial owners. (1) | |
Time | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |
28.05.2018 |
From Type of control: as a shareholder |
Awards | |
|
Comparative indices (2023 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Age of the company * 128166 - 128192 | 128166 - 128192 | ||
Net turnover
5960 , Major
|
5960 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
108008
|
108008 |
||
Equity capital
464
|
464 |
||
Fixed assets
354
|
354 |
||
Balance
528
|
528 |
||
Tangible assets
26859
|
26859 |
||
Liquidity
66480 - 66482 , Companies
|
66480 - 66482 |
Companies | |
Profitability
79203 , Companies
|
79203 |
Companies | |
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (1) | |
Paula Stradiņa klīniskās universitātes slimnīcas valdē iecelts Jānis Naglis | 15.12.2020 07:14 |
Klientu Portfeļa monitorings informē par izmaiņām VSIA “Paula Stradiņa klīniskā universitātes slimnīca” valdes sastāvā. Lursoft dati rāda, ka no valdes locekles amata atcelta Elita Buša, kura šajā amatā atradās jau kopš 2015.gada augusta, un viņas vietā valdē iecelts 1983.gadā dzimušais Jānis Naglis. |