Četri mazi eži, Vides klubs
Basic data | |
Name | Vides klubs "Četri mazi eži" |
Legal form | Society (BDR) |
Registration number, date | 50008181411, 28.07.2011 |
Register, Included in The Register | Register of Associations and Foundations, 28.07.2011 |
SEPA identifier | LV91ZZZ50008181411 |
Data from the VAT Register | Doesn't haveCheck in EU VAT register |
Legal address |
Legal address:
Ķekavas nov., Baloži, Ziedu iela 10, LV-2112
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
Postal address | Ziedu iela 10, Baloži, Ķekavas nov., LV-2112 |
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. B015893. 28.07.2011 |
Goals of activities |
Nepieļaut tālāku Latvijas tautas dzīves vides sagandēšanu, cīnīties pret šī procesa cēloņiem un veicināt tās atveseļošanu; veidot labsirdīgas vides un cilvēku savstarpējās attiecības; kopt sevī vienības ideju, apzinot sevi kā nepieciešamu daļu no vesela; kopt sevī iecietību un žēlsirdību un savstarpēju sapratni sabiedrībā; veicināt vispārēju cilvēktiesību ievērošanu, nepieļaut demokrātisko brīvību ierobežošanu; iesaistīties nedemokrātisku likumu labošanā, panākt izmaiņu īstenošanu dzīvē. |
Activity code (NACE) |
|
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 15.02.2019 |
Encumbrances | |
Liquidation process | Not registered |
Actual entry in the insolvency register | Not registered |
Current claims for payments | Sign in |
Actual pledge acts | Not registered |
Actual collaterals | Not registered |
Tax debts (as of date) |
Not registered as of 18.09.2024 Find out current information about tax debts |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (10) | |||
2023 , Annual report , 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 , 13.05.2024 | 01.01.2023 - 31.12.2023 | Annual report | 13.05.2024 |
2022 , Annual report , 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 , 29.02.2024 | 01.01.2022 - 31.12.2022 | Annual report | 29.02.2024 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 , 30.03.2022 | 01.01.2021 - 31.12.2021 | Annual report | 30.03.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 , 07.04.2021 | 01.01.2020 - 31.12.2020 | Annual report | 07.04.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 , 13.03.2020 | 01.01.2019 - 31.12.2019 | Annual report | 13.03.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 , 29.03.2019 | 01.01.2018 - 31.12.2018 | Annual report | 29.03.2019 |
2017 , Annual report , 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 , 03.04.2018 | 01.01.2017 - 31.12.2017 | Annual report | 03.04.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 , 01.04.2017 | 01.01.2016 - 31.12.2016 | Annual report | 01.04.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 , 01.04.2016 | 01.01.2015 - 31.12.2015 | Annual report | 01.04.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 , 01.04.2015 | 01.01.2014 - 31.12.2014 | Annual report | 01.04.2015 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2021 | Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. Executive body (2) | |||
Time | Post, Rights to represent | ||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 19.03.2015 |
Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia | |||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 15.02.2019 |
Right of sole representation |
||
Document country on the date of registration: Latvia |
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (2) | |||
Time | Country of residence | Citizenship | |
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 17.04.2018 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a member of association Sign in |
|||
Natural person(s) (xxxxxx-xxxxx) | |||
From 17.04.2018 | Latvia | Latvia | |
Type of control: as a member of association Sign in |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (0) | |
No publications found |