The Pier, Sabiedrība ar ierobežotu atbildību
Basic data | |||||||||||||
Name | Sabiedrība ar ierobežotu atbildību "The Pier" | ||||||||||||
Legal form | Limited liability company (SIA) | ||||||||||||
Registration number, date | 40003900443, 21.02.2007 | ||||||||||||
Register, Included in The Register | Commercial register, 21.02.2007 | ||||||||||||
SEPA identifier | LV22ZZZ40003900443 | ||||||||||||
Data from the VAT Register |
|
||||||||||||
Legal address |
Legal address:
Ropažu nov., Garkalnes pag., Berģi, "Augšvimbas", LV-1024 ***
Previous addresses Other registered in this address |
||||||||||||
Postal address | "Augšvimbas", Berģi, Garkalnes pag., Ropažu nov., LV-1024 | ||||||||||||
Liquidated | 22.06.2023 | ||||||||||||
Registration certificate number, date | Nr. K040452. 21.02.2007 | ||||||||||||
Fixed capital |
Paid capital - 2 828.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 23.02.2016) Registered capital - 2 828.00 EUR (Registered in State Enterprise register 23.02.2016) |
||||||||||||
Activity code (NACE) |
|
||||||||||||
Data updated in the Register of Enterprises | 22.06.2023 |
Contact information | |
Phone |
+371 67427733 +371 67030209 |
Financial indicators (last submitted year) | ||
Year (last submitted) | Sign in | |
Sign in | ||
Turnover | ||
Profit after taxes | ||
Liquidity | ||
Profitability (return on assets) | ||
Number of employees |
Annual reports (16) | |||
2022 , Annual report , 01.03.2022 - 28.02.2023 , 13.06.2023 | 01.03.2022 - 28.02.2023 | Annual report | 13.06.2023 |
2021 , Annual report , 01.03.2021 - 28.02.2022 , 30.09.2022 | 01.03.2021 - 28.02.2022 | Annual report | 30.09.2022 |
2020 , Annual report , 01.03.2020 - 28.02.2021 , 06.07.2021 | 01.03.2020 - 28.02.2021 | Annual report | 06.07.2021 |
2019 , Annual report , 01.03.2019 - 29.02.2020 , 02.07.2020 | 01.03.2019 - 29.02.2020 | Annual report | 02.07.2020 |
2018 , Annual report , 01.01.2018 - 28.02.2018 , 24.07.2018 | 01.01.2018 - 28.02.2018 | Annual report | 24.07.2018 |
2016 , Annual report , 01.03.2016 - 28.02.2017 , 04.07.2017 | 01.03.2016 - 28.02.2017 | Annual report | 04.07.2017 |
2015 , Annual report , 01.03.2015 - 29.02.2016 , 04.11.2016 | 01.03.2015 - 29.02.2016 | Annual report | 04.11.2016 |
2014 , Annual report , 01.03.2014 - 28.02.2015 , 27.06.2015 | 01.03.2014 - 28.02.2015 | Annual report | 27.06.2015 |
2013 , Annual report , 01.03.2013 - 28.02.2014 , 28.06.2014 | 01.03.2013 - 28.02.2014 | Annual report | 28.06.2014 |
2012 , Annual report , 01.03.2012 - 28.02.2013 , 02.07.2013 | 01.03.2012 - 28.02.2013 | Annual report | 02.07.2013 |
2011 , Annual report , 01.03.2011 - 29.02.2012 , 01.06.2012 | 01.03.2011 - 29.02.2012 | Annual report | 01.06.2012 |
2010 , Annual report , 01.03.2010 - 28.02.2011 , 25.05.2011 | 01.03.2010 - 28.02.2011 | Annual report | 25.05.2011 |
2009 , Annual report , 01.03.2009 - 28.02.2010 , 29.06.2010 | 01.03.2009 - 28.02.2010 | Annual report | 29.06.2010 |
2008 , Annual report , 01.03.2008 - 28.02.2009 , 19.06.2009 | 01.03.2008 - 28.02.2009 | Annual report | 19.06.2009 |
2007 , Annual report , 21.02.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 21.05.2008 | 21.02.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Annual report | 21.05.2008 |
2007 , Dependency Statement , 21.02.2007 - 31.12.2007 , 21.05.2008 | 21.02.2007 - 31.12.2007 | Dependency Statement | 21.05.2008 |
Tax payments to state budget (thous. EUR) |
|||
Year | Total payments to state budget | Personal income tax | State mandatory social insurance contributions |
2022 | Sign in | ||
2021 | |||
Sign in |
Actual data
Actual data. List of procurations (0) | ||||
No data |
Actual data. List of beneficial owners (0) | |||
No data |
Awards | |
|
Comparative indices (2022 year) | |||
Index | Place | ||
Net turnover
86547 - 113868 , Major
|
86547 - 113868 |
Major | |
Profit or loss
2317
|
2317 |
||
Equity capital
68058 - 68062
|
68058 - 68062 |
||
Fixed assets
69795 - 113868
|
69795 - 113868 |
||
Balance
93585 - 93596
|
93585 - 93596 |
||
Tangible assets
65481 - 113869
|
65481 - 113869 |
||
Liquidity
16023 , Companies
|
16023 |
Companies | |
Registered capital * 88908 - 89993 | 88908 - 89993 | ||
About the company's comparative indices |
Legal address on the map |
Publications (3) | |
Uzsākts "The Pier" likvidācijas process | 12.01.2023 06:22 |
Lursoft Klientu Portfeļa monitorings ziņo, ka vakar, 11. janvārī, uzsākts mājsaimniecības piederumu tirdzniecības uzņēmuma SIA “The Pier” likvidācijas process |
|
MAXIMA Latvija valdi atstājusi Kristīne Āboltiņa | 02.01.2020 07:55 |
Aizvadītā gada pēdējā darba dienā, 30.decembrī, izmaiņas reģistrētas mazumtirgotāja SIA “MAXIMA Latvija” valdes sastāvā. |
|
“The Pier” iecelts jauns valdes priekšsēdētājs | 21.08.2018 15:55 |
Mājsaimniecības preču mazumtirgotāja SIA “The Pier" līdzšinējais valdes priekšsēdētājs Luc Henri Maria Lauwers atstājis astoņus gadus ieņemto amatu un viņa vietā par uzņēmuma valdes priekšsēdētāju iecelts Willemien Louise Frederique van Dam, ziņo “Lursoft” Klientu portfelis. |